Accounts and annual returns FILM AND TELEVISION FREELANCE TRAINING

Charity Number: 294403
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 29 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 29 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 27 July 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 12 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 17 September 2008 On Time