THE HAZRAT SACHAL SARMAST TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping NHS. patients to carry out dental treatment for elderly patients and patients in financial difficulties at 28 Wood st. Barnet EN5 4BW. Also on the move to help Sindhi Mandir to find suitable scholar in Sindhi community in India to translet spiritual writings from Sindhi language to English for interested readers. We have decided to collect funds once a month in near future to send to poor
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 June 1986: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE HAZART SACHAL SARMAST TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07k | £1.07k | £0 | £1.07k | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 February 2013 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE PROMOTION AND STUDY OF THE SUFI RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE; AND (B) FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window