Governing document MANOR PARK ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE
Charity number: 294462

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED ON 27TH APRIL 1997, 8TH JUNE 2003 AND 19 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. (B) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.