Accounts and annual returns LEZIATE, ASHWICKEN AND BAWSEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 294476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required