ASSOCIATION OF QUALIFIED CURATIVE HYPNOTHERAPISTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 June 1986: Standard registration
- 11 September 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 September 2007: Funds transferred to 328122 EDDIE LEWIS TRUST
- A Q C H (Working name)
- AQCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65k | £6.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £2.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 16 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 07 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 30 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 1986, AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY THE PROMOTION OF THE SCIENCE AND ART OF CURATIVE HYPNOTHERAPY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN CURATIVE HYPNOTHERAPY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window