Financial history ST FAITH'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 294515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.55k £13.50k £22.83k £20.49k £19.09k
Total expenditure £7.28k £11.95k £21.59k £21.00k £12.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A