ST FAITH'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to advance the education of pupils in the school. We do this by engaging in fundraising activities to provide essential equipment, experiences and other extra curricular events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 28 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Louise Williams | Chair | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cooney | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Reeve | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amalie Nicole Brown | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Hyland | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Victoria McKay | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katya Partridge | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley June Cole | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.55k | £13.50k | £22.83k | £20.49k | £19.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.28k | £11.95k | £21.59k | £21.00k | £12.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 February 2025 | 241 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 April 2023 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 March 2022 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH NOVEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 19 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Faiths Primary School
St. Faiths Road
WINCHESTER
SO23 9QB
- Phone:
- 01962 854934
- Email:
- st.faiths.sa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window