TRAINING SHIP BROADSWORD SEA TRAINING CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Corps is a voluntary youth organisation for Boys and Girls. It aims to develop qualities of self-discipline and leadership and provides a service to the community. We believe this is an important function in todays multicultural and multifaith society and that we are helping to develop good citizens for the future. Our organization is run on Naval routines and traditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Brent
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 July 1986: Standard registration
- T S BROADSWORD (Working name)
- HENDON AND KINGSBURY SEA TRAINING CORPS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Jacobs | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LT. PAUL TURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ALISON BECK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CDR MBE BED GERALD FRANCIS BECK MBE BED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Alan Mason | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.27k | £43.06k | £55.65k | £66.06k | £56.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.03k | £34.65k | £53.89k | £65.01k | £53.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH MAY 1986 AS AMENDED ON 16 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AN SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ORDER THAT THEY MIGHT DEVELOP INTO RESPONSIBLE ADULT MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF NAUTICAL AND OTHER STUDIES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF BARNET AND BRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Glenwood Avenue
Kingsbury
LONDON
NW9 7PL
- Phone:
- 02082006286
- Email:
- geraldandjean@seacadet.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window