Financial history THE BOXER RESCUE SERVICE (SOUTHERN)

Charity number: 294544
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.49k £40.32k £82.74k £57.48k £273.19k
Total expenditure £93.03k £62.88k £76.87k £65.08k £75.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A