Financial history KINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 294561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.44k £12.00k £10.36k £6.78k £7.16k
Total expenditure £6.54k £6.85k £7.53k £11.20k £8.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £5.91k N/A N/A