THE PEACOCK (LEEDS) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Bangladesh
- India
Governance
- 09 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Richard Whitehead | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew William Preston Peacock | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE JOSEPHINE WHITEHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH LOUISE PRESTON PEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSANNA JANE PRESTON WHITEHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.90k | £8.90k | £9.00k | £9.35k | £9.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.85k | £8.88k | £9.26k | £9.36k | £9.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH MAY 1986
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 DUNSTARN LANE
LEEDS
LS16 8EN
- Phone:
- 01132678868
- Email:
- roswhitehead19@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window