MIDSUMMER OPERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting 2 operatic projects per season plus recitals by company principals and contributions by our chorus to other organizations' performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 1986: Standard registration
- SOUNDS LYRICAL (Working name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER DENZIL HOLLIS BA | Chair | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS CAROL FINE | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRIAN PAUL FINE MA, MB | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN UPPERTON | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN ROBLOU | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr GORDON MIZNER | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.61k | £3.74k | £10.99k | £21.52k | £31.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.25k | £7.33k | £8.65k | £23.07k | £32.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH MAY 1986
Charitable objects
PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF OPERA, MUSIC, SINGING, DRAMA, BALLET, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 ALGERNON ROAD
LONDON
SE13 7AP
- Phone:
- 020 7652 0070
- Email:
- info@midsummeropera.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window