WARGRAVE PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wargrave Pre-School is dedicated to the philosophy of learning through play and encourages children to learn in an enjoyable and stimulating environment. Our curriculum is planned in line with the Early Years Foundation Stage as outlined by the Government's Department of Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 27 June 1986: Standard registration
- WARGRAVE YOUTH CENTRE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Loyd | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Qualtrough | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aoife Bermingham - McDonogh | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Laura Classen | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.21k | £71.46k | £173.32k | £102.90k | £154.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.36k | £101.45k | £85.05k | £103.53k | £143.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £69.57k | £50.46k | £75.76k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £57.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 October 2020 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/01/1981 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART; (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN. (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE YOUTH CENTRE
RECREATION GROUND
EAST VIEW ROAD
WARGRAVE
BERKSHIRE
RG10 8BH
- Phone:
- 01189403127
- Email:
- info@wargravepreschool.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window