THE READING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 294640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £170,531
Total expenditure: £399,612

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 September 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD CHILDS Chair 17 August 2012
None on record
Dozie Nnabuife Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Emma Fallon Trustee 23 November 2023
None on record
Jaykumar Vijay Mistry Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Menaka Shankar Murthy Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
DAVID RUSSELL DEFOREST HUDSON Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
THOMAS CHRISTIAN PINKERTON EVANS Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
TERENCE COLIN FOLLEN Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
JONATHAN MATTHEWS Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
EDMUND SULEY HOLT Trustee 23 November 2017
OLD REDINGENSIANS ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
MARK NICHOLAS JOHN FAULKNER Trustee 16 March 2017
None on record
CLAIRE TOMS Trustee 24 November 2016
None on record
Prof MARTIN PARSONS Trustee 20 November 2014
None on record
ASHLEY MARK ROBSON Trustee 24 February 2014
None on record
Ameet Keshao Phadnis Trustee 24 February 2014
None on record
RODNEY PHILIP HUGGINS Trustee 12 March 2000
WOODLEY SANDFORD AND CHARVIL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF LODDON VALE TRUST FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £118.81k £211.60k £211.60k £220.39k £170.53k
Total expenditure £227.01k £214.19k £245.19k £319.97k £399.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 04 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 04 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 June 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 June 2024 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 06 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 06 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 April 2023 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 06 April 2023 310 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME SEALED 4 JULY 1994
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, CHILDREN ABOUT TO ATTEND THE SCHOOL AND FORMER PUPILS WHO ATTENDED THE SCHOOL FOR NOT LESS THAN 2 YEARS IN PARTICULAR IN AWARDING ALLOWANCES, LEAVING EXHIBITIONS AND PRIZES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 September 1997 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
READING SCHOOL
MAIN HOUSE
ERLEIGH ROAD
READING
RG1 5LW
Phone:
01189015600