SOCIETY FOR ANGLO-CHINESE UNDERSTANDING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society was founded over fifty six years ago to promote understanding and friendship between the peoples of Britain and China. SACU - which has no political affiliations - plays a vital role in providing regular and reliable information about China and the Chinese people including through its publications and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 June 1986: Standard registration
- 18 January 2020: Funds received from 1079096 THE CHINA GROUP (QUAKERS)
- SACU (Working name)
- SOCIETY FOR ANGLO-CHINESE UNDERSTANDING (Previous name)
- SOCIETY FOR ANGLO-CHINESE UNDERSTANDING LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ching Man Iris Yau | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fang Wang | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Barnaby Powell | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Robert Peter Jarvis | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Antrobus | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Hicks | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
WALTER FUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Zoe Kim Reed | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.56k | £7.61k | £10.85k | £11.62k | £7.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.06k | £3.67k | £4.13k | £11.25k | £12.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 24 JAN 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF CHINA AND THE CHINESE PEOPLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (I) TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL TRIPS TO CHINA; (II) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE EDUCATIONAL COURSES OF ACTIVITIES AND SEMINARS; (III) TO AWARD BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS FOR STUDY IN GREAT BRITAIN AND ELSEWHERE AND FOR TRAVEL FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUCH STUDY. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHINESE PEOPLE IN ALL ASPECTS OF GREAT BRITAIN AND THE BRITISH PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15A NAPOLEON ROAD
TWICKENHAM
TW1 3EW
- Phone:
- 07768 207702
- Email:
- info@sacu.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window