Trustees THE WEST SURREY GOLF CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 294664

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Polkey | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Patricia White | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger de Peyrecave | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Lloyd-Williams | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ian Taylor | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin MacNiven | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcom McMullan | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORMAN AMEY | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.