NORWICH CATHEDRAL CHOIR ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide scholarships towards school fees for up to 20 Norwich Cathedral choristers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 August 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL BARRY QUARLES BACK | Chair |
|
||||||||||
David Flood | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Very Reverend Dr Andrew Jonathan Braddock | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Aidan Stephen George Platten | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.41k | £509.80k | £165.09k | £133.99k | £434.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.79k | £150.41k | £150.62k | £158.11k | £177.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £404.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £105.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £378 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £8.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £150.41k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6TH MAY 1986 AS VARIED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 11TH APRIL 1991.
Charitable objects
PROVISION, PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF MUSIC IN THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF NORWICH BY THE AWARD IN EACH YEAR OF A SCHOLARSHIP OR SCHOLARSHIPS TO ONE OR MORE OF THE CHORISTERS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE CATHEDRAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHAPTER OFFICE
65 THE CLOSE
NORWICH
NR1 4DH
- Phone:
- 01603218300
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window