Accounts and annual returns THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES

Charity number: 294678
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2005 11 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 11 April 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 15 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 15 April 2005 On Time