HEATHROW SPECIAL NEEDS FARM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heathrow Farm is a small charitable concern providing a working farm environment with facilities designed with disabled people in mind. The farm provides therapeutic benefits that come from caring for animals and plants. Our aims are to develop skills, provide work experience and most importantly to foster a sense of personal achievement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 July 1986: Standard registration
- 28 April 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 28 April 2016: Funds transferred to 1155421 HEATHROW SPECIAL NEEDS CENTRE
- SPELTHORNE FARM (Working name)
- TA HEATHROW SPECIAL NEEDS FARM (Working name)
- THE SPELTHORNE FARM PROJECT FOR THE HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.11k | £97.26k | £78.38k | £101.87k | £49.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.82k | £100.14k | £76.73k | £83.64k | £40.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 31 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 10 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 12 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 08 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 01 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 01 June 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH MAY 1986, AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17TH JANUARY 2000 AND TRUSTEE MEETING 18 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE A FARMSTEAD FOR MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF THE FACILITIES PROVIDED AT THE FARM BY REASON OF THEIR AGE OR INFIRMITY. (B) THE TRUSTEES SHALL GIVE PREFERENCE: (1) FIRSTLY TO CHILDREN; AND (2) SECONDLY TO YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25; RESIDENT IN OR AROUND THE FOLLOWING BOROUGHS IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (A) THE BOROUGH OF SPELTHORNE; (B) THE BOROUGH OF RUNNYMEDE OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON
Area of benefit
(A) THE BOROUGH OF SPELTHORNE; (B) THE BOROUGH OF RUNNYMEDE OR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window