TADS THEATRE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance of plays, education and entertainment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 29 April 1987: Standard registration
- THE TADS THEATRE GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Stanton | Chair | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Venn | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wilden | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Connie Wiltshire | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elise Crosby | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Venn | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Darren Adams | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Scowen | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Price | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anni Bacon | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Rust | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lidford | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Paul Horsler | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.04k | £24.91k | £24.01k | £14.24k | £26.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.98k | £9.06k | £19.24k | £25.94k | £24.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.15k | £8.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 21/05/1986 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2015 as amended on 18 May 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE DRAMATIC AND ALLIED ARTS AND TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC TASTE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TADS Theatre
Conger Lane
Toddington
DUNSTABLE
Bedfordshire
- Phone:
- 07488326134
- Email:
- enquiries@tadstheatre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window