Accounts and annual returns BILLERICAY CITIZENS' ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 294706
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 04 March 2005 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 04 March 2005 32 days late