THE ROWLAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply both capital and income of the Trust in the preservation and repair of the fabric of Sidmouth Parish Church, St Giles & St Nicholas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 23 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Mason Swinburn | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Wade | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Bailey | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Mason | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Byrd | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|||||
PHILIP EDWIN HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.04k | £6.27k | £30.83k | £19.49k | £18.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £38.57k | £7.63k | £20.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH JUNE 1986 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST GILES AND ST NICHOLAS, SIDMOUTH
Area of benefit
SIDMOUTH PARISH CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
PENNY ROYAL
MUTTERSMOOR ROAD
SIDMOUTH
EX10 8RH
- Phone:
- 01395516373
- Website:
-
philipandsheilahughes@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window