31ST GRAVESEND ST AIDANS SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 294742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting scouting within the kent area to the youth. Outdoor activities, climbing, walking, archery and camping. Indoor activities, badge work and meetings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £23,881
Total expenditure: £10,213

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 June 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST AIDANS SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
stephen ferguson Chair 30 January 2000
None on record
GWYNETH PEREIRA Trustee 08 October 2022
None on record
Christopher Norman Trustee 31 October 2018
None on record
Violet Rushbrook Trustee 02 January 2018
None on record
Sandra Ferguson Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
CHRISTOPHER WALLIS Trustee 05 February 2014
None on record
ANDREW JARVIS Trustee 17 February 1982
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.45k £20.86k £10.09k £10.94k £23.88k
Total expenditure £7.15k £8.90k £5.22k £7.17k £10.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.19k £8.00k N/A £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Milton Place
GRAVESEND
Kent
DA12 2BT
Phone:
01474396091
Website:

No information available