THE REDBOURNE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for the benefit of members of Finchley Central Federation Synagogue and for the distribution of charity to organisations and individuals at the discretion of the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Barnet
Governance
- 07 July 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Dony | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MR BARRY SAIPE | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR SIMON BARNARD PHD;FCOPTOM;FAAO;DIPCL;DIPCLIN.OPTO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.17k | £5.47k | £6.01k | £10.47k | £16.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.62k | £3.09k | £3.62k | £7.00k | £10.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2024 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2024 | 653 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 January 2022 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 January 2022 | 432 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE THE FINCHLEY CENTRAL SYNAGOGUE OR ANY OTHER CHARTIABLE JEWISH ORGANISATION WHEREVER SITUATE AND TO SUPPORT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE CAUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Carlisle Lodge
82 Hendon Lane
Finchley
LONDON
- Phone:
- 01923225201
- Email:
- henry@dony.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window