Accounts and annual returns THE TIBETAN REFUGEE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 294761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 16 August 2024 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window