THE VEGETARIAN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and sickness amongst children and young persons up to the age of 25 who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress, and who are vegetarians or vegans. To educate children and young persons in the principles of vegetarianism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 July 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eve Crump | Chair | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tony Mackrell | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Howard | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Brasch | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Collins | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNA PATTENDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Susan Lenihan | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHRYN MURIEL LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.30k | £23.18k | £30.13k | £30.69k | £442.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.79k | £34.70k | £41.32k | £32.56k | £29.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JUNE 1986 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 1987 AND 9 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE VEGETARIAN OR VEGAN. (B) TO EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UP TO AND INCLUDING THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE PRINCIPLES OF VEGETARIANISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 MEADOW BANK
MANCHESTER
M21 8EE
- Phone:
- 07792277416
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window