THE SEAFORD DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seaford Little Theatre presents four plays each year in our theatre which holds approximately 100 people. The cast consist of all ages. The theatre is also used by other groups for their social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 02 July 1986: Standard registration
- SEAFORD LITTLE THEATRE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.53k | £28.44k | £9.07k | £23.92k | £29.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.01k | £29.21k | £18.97k | £20.25k | £22.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2022 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 February 2022 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE RULES OF THE SOCIETY AMENDED ON 16TH MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 1ST JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, PARTICULARLY THE ART AND SCIENCE OF DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seaford Little Theatre
4 Steyne Road
SEAFORD
East Sussex
BN25 1HA
- Phone:
- 01323894938
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window