Sandgate Youth Football Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide football as a leisure activity so that young children can learn be part of a team and club. Also to strengthen their social skills. The club also raises money for local deserving causes by holding an annual charity day and 6 a side football tournament.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £1,430 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 05 August 1986: Standard registration
- SANDGATE BOYS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK UPJOHN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TONY HEATH | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
lorraine Kennedy | Trustee | 29 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEVE KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.38k | £68.03k | £66.00k | £61.08k | £90.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.51k | £67.54k | £82.40k | £67.37k | £69.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.50k | N/A | £21.87k | N/A | £1.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
02 November 2024 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH JUNE 1981 AND AMENDED 4TH JUNE 1986 as amended on 13 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS, PARTICULARY THOSE AGED BETWEEN 10 AND 18 AND RESIDENT IN OR NEAR HAYES, THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR HAYES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Club house
Bourne farm playing fields
Rear off skipton drive
Hayes
UB3 1PL
- Phone:
- 07888356764
- Email:
- enquiries@sandgatefc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window