EALING FAMILY HOUSING ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Ealing
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 11 September 1986: Standard registration
- 20 February 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 20 February 2007: Funds transferred to 1113922 CATALYST HOUSING CHARITABLE TRUST
- EALING FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.51k | £56.98k | £57.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.16k | £51.28k | £52.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 15 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 15 September 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 10 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 30 September 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF PERSONS (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, AGE, POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS OR RACE, NATIONALITY OF COLOUR) WHEN IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window