KSI MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are the propagation and promotion of the spiritual, educational and humanitahan teachings of the Shia ithna-asheri Muslim Faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 15 July 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mohamedsuhel Chagani | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hasnain Datoo | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zaheed Panjwani | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naushad Dhanji | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Riaz Dhanji | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Asgher Sultan | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.41k | £166.19k | £130.95k | £139.94k | £171.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.40k | £126.24k | £105.74k | £124.90k | £156.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
THE PROPAGATION OF THE SHIA ITHANASHERI MUSLIM. FAITH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KSIMC of Milton Keynes
Peverel Drive
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK1 1NW
- Phone:
- 07919874010
- Email:
- treasurer@ksimk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window