WANTAGE AND GROVE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to encourage older citizens no longer in full time employment to meet and share their knowledge, skills, interests and experiences whatever their background with others in a social and welcoming atmosphere. Our activities include talks, small study groups, outings and social gatherings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 July 1986: Standard registration
- WANTAGE U3A (Working name)
- WANTAGE ASSOCIATION OF STUDENTS OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Denton | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Sorrell | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Hancock | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Clarke | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wanda Clarke | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
June Grunwald | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Denton | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID COATES | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gregory | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.95k | £4.74k | £5.53k | £5.63k | £25.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.48k | £4.19k | £5.80k | £5.93k | £25.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/01/1986 AS AMENDED ON 09/01/1990 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
WANTAGE AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Woodfield
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX12 9AL
- Phone:
- 07903152567
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window