ENVIRONMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Its objectives are (i) to secure the preservation, protection, development of features of beauty or public interest for the public benefit of the inhabitants of of Richmond upon Thames and neighbouring Boroughs and, (ii) to preserve for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Boroughs, whatever of English historical, architectural, constructional or natural heritage may exist in the Boroughs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £57,950 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 30 July 1986: Standard registration
- 06 April 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 06 April 2022: Funds transferred to 1140872 Habitats & Heritage
- ENVIRONMENT TRUST FOR RICHMOND UPON THAMES (Previous name)
- THE ENVIRONMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- THE ENVIRONMENT TRUST FOR RICHMOND UPON THAMES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.85k | £255.44k | £194.65k | £246.56k | £148.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.42k | £182.76k | £265.66k | £254.65k | £234.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £4.50k | £0 | £1.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £16.50k | £8.75k | £144.72k | £57.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 18 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 18 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 27 June 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 AUG 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 SEP 2018 as amended on 06 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF BEAUTY OR HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE BOROUGHS”) (B) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGHS AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF ENGLISH HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTIONAL OR NATURAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN THE BOROUGHS IN THE FORM OF LAND AND BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL CONSTRUCTIONAL OR NATURAL INTEREST (C) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARCHITECTURAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL HERITAGE OF THE AREA AND TO ENCOURAGE THE ENJOYMENT OF THIS HERITAGE
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window