Financial history JFSPA - JFS Parents Association

Charity number: 294872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £267 £334 £10 £10 £5.64k
Total expenditure £6.20k £13 £10 £10 £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A