Financial history THE ALAN SUGAR FOUNDATION

Charity number: 294880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £35 £11 £0 £8.00m £349.62k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £927.01k £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £8.00m N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £927.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £6.00k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £8 N/A