Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH THORPE IN THE BOROUGH OF RUNNYMEDE

Charity number: 294892
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2011 17 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 17 December 2011 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 18 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required