Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH THORPE IN THE BOROUGH OF RUNNYMEDE

Charity number: 294892
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011
Total gross income £3.59k £672 £433 £301 £251
Total expenditure £0 £4.24k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A