HOMECALL HOME VISITING SCHEME FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home visiting scheme for the visually impaired in Bexhill, East Sussex and surrounding areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 29 July 1986: Standard registration
- 23 March 2011: Funds received from 273032 THE BEXHILL FRIENDS OF THE ELDERLY
- HOMECALL (Working name)
- HOME VISITING SCHEME FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED (Previous name)
- HOMECALL FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED (Previous name)
- HOMECALL HOME VISITING SCHEMES FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Cox | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ilkay Schofield | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Best | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joy Sandra Turner | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Plim | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER STILES | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Blatchly | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Helen Merryfield | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Farrer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.44k | £7.99k | £6.58k | £133.86k | £16.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.41k | £20.57k | £7.99k | £27.59k | £36.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 1991, 20 JUNE 1992, 17 MAY 1997, 13 JUNE 1998, 24 OCTOBER 2006, 17 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE LIVING IN BEXHILL ON SEA AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SUBSTANTIALLY VISUALLY IMPAIRED, INCLUDING THOSE REGISTERED AS BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED.
Area of benefit
BEXHILL ON SEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Ashcombe Drive
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN39 3UJ
- Phone:
- 07803121324
- Email:
- sec.homecall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window