Governing document HOMECALL HOME VISITING SCHEME FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED
Charity number: 294901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 1991, 20 JUNE 1992, 17 MAY 1997, 13 JUNE 1998, 24 OCTOBER 2006, 17 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE LIVING IN BEXHILL ON SEA AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE SUBSTANTIALLY VISUALLY IMPAIRED, INCLUDING THOSE REGISTERED AS BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BEXHILL ON SEA AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.