Trustees HOMECALL HOME VISITING SCHEME FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED
Charity number: 294901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Cox | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ilkay Schofield | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Best | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joy Sandra Turner | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Plim | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER STILES | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Blatchly | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Helen Merryfield | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Farrer | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.