Accounts and annual returns TELSCOMBE CLIFFS NURSERY

Charity Number: 294903
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2017 28 September 2018 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 September 2018 120 days late
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2015 18 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 November 2015 On Time