RESOUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 25 July 1986: Standard registration
- BRISTOL CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL DESMOND CARTER | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Berndes | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Oluwakemi Odi | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard John PORTER | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH BENNETT | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.28k | £155.09k | £162.77k | £145.22k | £139.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.73k | £137.98k | £150.44k | £152.38k | £122.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.02k | £389 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.99k | £10.12k | £1.00k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/06/1986 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/07/2012
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE UNDERWRITTEN FOURTH SCHEDULE AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTIN AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. 2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOINING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AN IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF UCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
AVON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
RESOUND
BLACKHORSE ROAD
MANGOTSFIELD
BRISTOL
BS16 9BP
- Phone:
- 01173050969
- Email:
- office@resoundbristol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window