AXMINSTER MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing and maintaining the Axminster Museum, it's displays, archives and collections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 26 July 1986: Standard registration
- 10 December 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 December 2014: Funds transferred to 1113818 AXMINSTER HERITAGE LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | £1.50k | £1.31k | £2.16k | £930 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.62k | £1.62k | £1.82k | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 06 December 2014 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 25 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 13 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 14 July 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
OBJECT AND RULES ADOPTED 27TH FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM IN AXMINSTER IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON.
Area of benefit
AXMINSTER DEVON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window