Financial history THE EMSWORTH MARITIME AND HISTORICAL TRUST

Charity number: 294965
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.59k £21.41k £23.82k £13.97k £16.86k
Total expenditure £32.71k £22.28k £21.25k £12.40k £21.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.71k N/A £592 N/A