Financial history HASTINGS AREA ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH GROUP (HAARG)

Charity Number: 294989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.95k £3.78k £865 £1.83k £2.02k
Total expenditure £3.28k £1.72k £1.75k £1.07k £1.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A