Trustees HASTINGS AREA ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH GROUP (HAARG)

Charity Number: 294989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lynn Cornwell Chair 07 May 2022
None on record
Barbara Young Trustee 12 April 2023
None on record
Laura Wares Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
Roy Dunmall Trustee 06 December 2017
None on record
Ethan Greenwood Trustee 28 June 2017
None on record
Stewart Angell Trustee 02 September 2015
None on record
Richard Axe Trustee 26 November 2014
None on record
Kevin Cornwell Trustee 13 April 2005
None on record