SUNG WAH TAOIST ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) Relief of poverty or sickness with particular reference to those persons who are homeless b) Promote and support of research into problems of poverty and the publication of the useful results of such research c) Promote the teaching of Confucius Tao and Buddha
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VEN FU WA TANG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tak Fong Wong | Trustee | 14 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JEE SIEW HAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WORD-FEI CHEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HING FOOK HAU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PO-YU YEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Lien Xuan HOANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAM SAU CHONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KENG-CHUEN TSUI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.59k | £7.43k | £22.14k | £41.58k | £26.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.35k | £5.62k | £12.46k | £40.31k | £14.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12TH JULY 1986
Charitable objects
(A) RELIEF OF POVERTY OR SICKNESS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS. (B) PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF RESEARCH INTO PROBLEMS OF POVERTY AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) TO PROMOTING THE TEACHING OF CONFUCIOUS TAO AND BUDDHA. (D) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TO ESTABLISH SCHOOLS FOR IMPOVERISHED CHILDREN TO SET UP SCHOLARSHIPS, TO ARRANGE EXHIBITIONS AND LIBRARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Scorton Avenue
Perivale
GREENFORD
UB6 8LA
- Phone:
- 07702735480
- Email:
- pohbear@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window