Trustees SUTTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 295051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Shepherd Chair 06 June 2015
None on record
Susan Dudman Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
David Green Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
Wendy Hunter Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
Jo Welman Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
Bridget Lynne Reid Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record
Rosemary Elliott Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
TONY SAWARD Trustee 25 October 2012
None on record
JOHN COLLIS Trustee
None on record