THE FRIENDS OF GIBRALTAR HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are to protect, conserve and promote the protection, preservation and conservation of the character of Gibraltar.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Gibraltar
Governance
- 02 September 1986: Standard registration
- FOGHS (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF GIBRALTAR (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vice-Admiral Sir Adrian James Johns KCB CBE DL | Chair | 09 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Ross Gordon McNally | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Francis Goss | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MARY SPENCER SCHERR | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Malcolm Hucker | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Constance Johnson | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|||||
Professor Charles Ramirez | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Charles Julian Aldwyn Lyne-Pirkis | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Richard John Lord | Trustee | 11 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vincent John Julius Mifsud | Trustee | 11 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
Albert Andrew Poggio GMH OBE | Trustee | 31 December 1991 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.65k | £9.30k | £13.48k | £13.51k | £13.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.50k | £13.13k | £19.18k | £18.84k | £15.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 18 DECEMBER 1991, 7 FEBRUARY 1996 AND 12 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ABOUT GIBRALTAR, ITS HISTORY, PEOPLE AND STRUCTURES (B) TO PROTECT, PRESERVE, RESTORE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY LANDS, BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS OR OTHER STRUCTURES, ORDNANCE AND OTHER ARTEFACTS IN GIBRALTAR WHICH ARE OF NATURAL INTEREST OR BEAUTY OR ARCHITECTURAL OR HISTORIC INTEREST AND AS REGARDS SUCH LANDS TO SECURE THE PROTECTION OF THEIR NATURAL ASPECT AND SURROUNDINGS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THEIR NATURAL FEATURES AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE. (C) TO PROTECT AND CONSERVE OR PROMOTE THE PROTECTION, PERMANENT PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE CHARACTER AND HERITAGE OF GIBRALTAR. (D) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN AND CONCERNING THE CONSERVATION OF GIBRALTAR'S HERITAGE AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE APPLICATION OF AESTHETIC STANDARDS TO ITS CONTEMPORARY ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
150 STRAND
LONDON
WC2R 1JA
- Phone:
- 07876290000
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window