FEN EDGE ASSOCIATION FOR THE LEARNING DISABLED (F.E.A.L.D)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FEALD arranges and funds social and leisure events for people with learning disabilities in the Fen Edge Educational Area of South Cambs. The charity also gives grants to individuals for holidays and leisure activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 17 September 1986: Standard registration
- F E A L D (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF RESIDENTIAL MENTALLY HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew David McLees | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bullman | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Ingham | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANN WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR JOHN GRANGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £793 | £1.42k | £552 | £1.14k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £415 | £1.44k | £2.01k | £2.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JULY 1986
Charitable objects
(I)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AND ADVANCE RELIGION AMONG MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS.(II)TO RELIEVE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WHEATSHEAF HOUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 BROAD LANE
COTTENHAM
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 8AJ
- Phone:
- 01954250024
- Email:
- l.j.mowlabocus@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window