TAUNTON UNIT 597 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 295097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Using the traditions and values of the Royal Navy the charity aims to provide young people experiences and knowledge that they would be hard pressed to find in their normal lives. It is a uniformed youth organisation and aims to promote discipline and teamwork.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £10,636
Total expenditure: £6,710

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 November 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T S ROEBUCK (Working name)
  • TS ROEBUCK (Working name)
  • TAUNTON UNIT SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HERMAN DE BOER Chair 21 March 2014
None on record
Rachel Louise Dunn Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
Ian Fudge Trustee 16 October 2018
None on record
Doris Wood Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Rebecca Kerswell Trustee 04 April 2016
None on record
Prebendary Adrian Prior-Sankey MBE Trustee
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN SOMERSET
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £16.24k £7.34k £6.38k £9.59k £10.64k
Total expenditure £17.67k £6.18k £4.94k £11.89k £6.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Building 133
Norton Manor Camp
Norton Fitzwarren
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA2 6PF
Phone:
01823 288955